EP2198377 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF INTERACTING WITH A SERVER, AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING AND PRESENTING SEARCH RESULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wong, Chin San Sathya No. 5, Jalan Songkit 11 Taman Sentosa 80150 Johore Bahru Johor / MY | [2012/45] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Wong, Chin San Sathya GPO Box 277 Melbourne, VIC 3001 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08737588.7 | 06.02.2008 | [2010/25] | WO2008IB01107 | Priority number, date | WO2007IB03022 | 06.09.2007 Original published format: PCT/IB2007/003022 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009030990 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2198377 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04L9/00 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
G06F16/248 (EP,US);
G06F16/24578 (EP,US);
G06F16/3326 (EP,US);
G06F16/9038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR INTERAKTION MIT EINEM SERVER UND VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ERZEUGEN UND PRÄSENTIEREN VON SUCHERGEBNISSEN | [2010/25] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF INTERACTING WITH A SERVER, AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING AND PRESENTING SEARCH RESULTS | [2010/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'INTERACTION AVEC UN SERVEUR, ET PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR PRODUIRE ET PRÉSENTER DES RÉSULTATS DE RECHERCHE | [2010/25] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 01.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007059153 (AOL LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0123] * * figures 8A, 11 *; | [X]WO2006094097 (WINK TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2006235860 (BREWER BRETT D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0138] * | International search | [X]US6683954 (SEARLE SCOTT [US]) [X] 1-10 * Entire document, in particular: abstract, figure 1, columns 2, 5, 7 and 8. *; | [X]WO2007089403 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 11, 16-19, 21, 23, 25, 35 * Entire document, in particular, abstract, Fig. 1-3; page 3, paragraph 0011- page 4, paragraph 0014; page 5, paragraph 0015; page 6, paragraphs 0017; page 9, paragraph 0023 *; | [XY]US2005278317 (GROSS WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 30-31 * Entire document, in particular: paragraphs 0018, 0019, 0020, 0022, * [Y] 32-33; | [Y]US6871287 (ELLINGSON JOHN F [US]) [Y] 32-33 * Entire document, in particular: column 20 *; | [PXA]EP1862916 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [PX] 11, 16, 34-35 * ; Whole document, in particular, abstract, column 2, paragraph 0010, column 3, paragraphs 0013, 0018; column 5, paragraphs 0030; column 5, paragraph 0032 -column 6, paragraph, 0035; Figures 1-6 * [A] 12-15, 17 2-5, 7; | [A]WO03024140 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * Entire document *; | [A]US2006143160 (VAYSSIERE JULIEN J [AU]) [A] 11-29 * ; Whole document *; | [A]US2005210024 (HURST-HILLER OLIVER [US], et al) [A] 11-29 * ; Whole document *; | [A]US2005022020 (FREMBERG DANIEL [SE]) [A] 1-10 * Entire document *; | [A]US2006047643 (CHAMAN CHIRAG [US]) [A] 30-33 * Entire document *; | [A]US2005071328 (LAWRENCE STEPHEN R [US]) [A] 30-33 * Entire document Note for Y documents: combine GROSS with ELLINGSON * |