Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2134870

EP2134870 - UTILITY OF SNP MARKERS ASSOCIATED WITH MAJOR SOYBEAN PLANT MATURITY AND GROWTH HABIT GENOMIC REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/52]UTILITY OF SNP MARKERS ASSOCIATED WITH MAJOR SOYBEAN PLANT MATURITY AND GROWTH HABIT GENOMIC REGIONS
[2013/42]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.11.2017
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Monsanto Technology, LLC
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis, MO 63167 / US
[2009/52]
Inventor(s)01 / JENKINSON, Jonathan
603 Crystal Street
Ames Iowa 50010 / US
02 / TAMULONIS, John
62977 Michelle Drive
Nevada Iowa 50201 / US
03 / NARVEL, James
203 Beckington Court
Middletown Delaware 19709 / US
04 / GRUYS, Kenneth
1112 Cottonwood Court
Davis California 94518 / US
05 / VALENTIN, Henry, E.
2792 Brentwood Place
Davis California 94518 / US
 [2013/43]
Former [2009/52]01 / JENKINSON, Jonathan
603 Crystal Street
Ames, Iowa 50010 / US
02 / TAMULONIS, John
62977 Michelle Drive
Nevada, Iowa 50201 / US
03 / NARVEL, James
203 Beckington Court
Middletown, Delaware 19709 / US
04 / GRUYS, Kenneth
1112 Cottonwood Court
Davis, California 94518 / US
05 / VALENTIN, Henry, E.
2792 Brentwood Place
Davis, California 94518 / US
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/09]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/52]Helbing, Jörg
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 Deichmannhaus am Dom
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date08742297.827.03.2008
[2009/52]
WO2008US03973
Priority number, dateUS20070920531P28.03.2007         Original published format: US 920531 P
US20070001049P31.10.2007         Original published format: US 1049 P
[2013/43]
Former [2009/52]US20070920531P28.03.2007
US2007000104931.10.2007
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008121291
Date:09.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2134870
Date:23.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2008
[2009/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2134870
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2013/42]
Former International [2009/52]C12Q1/68, A01H5/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/52]
TitleGerman:NUTZEN VON SNP-MARKERN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT GENOMISCHEN BEREICHEN FÜR REIFE UND WACHSTUMSGEWOHNHEIT WICHTIGER SOJABOHNENARTEN[2013/43]
English:UTILITY OF SNP MARKERS ASSOCIATED WITH MAJOR SOYBEAN PLANT MATURITY AND GROWTH HABIT GENOMIC REGIONS[2013/43]
French:UTILITÉ DE MARQUEURS SNP ASSOCIÉS AVEC DES RÉGIONS MAJEURES DU PORT ET DE LA MATURITÉ DE PLANTES DE SOJA[2013/43]
Former [2009/52]NUTZEN VON SNP-MARKERN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT GENOMISCHEN BEREICHEN FÜR REIFE UND WACHSTUMSGEWOHNHEIT WICHTIGER SOJABOHNENARTEN
Former [2009/52]UTILITY OF SNP MARKERS ASSOCIATED WITH MAJOR SOYBEAN PLANT MATURITY AND GROWTH HABIT GENOMIC REGIONS
Former [2009/52]UTILITÉ DE MARQUEURS SNP ASSOCIÉS AVEC DES RÉGIONS MAJEURES DU PORT ET DE LA MATURITÉ DE PLANTES DE SOJA
Entry into regional phase21.09.2009National basic fee paid 
21.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/52]
08.12.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2014Fee for grant paid
11.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2014   
Erklärung von Bern(CH)/Swissaid, Caroline Morel (CH)/Gene Watch UK(GB)/Red de Semillas(ES)/Rete Semi Rurali(IT)/Verein Arche N
Dienerstrassse 12
8005 Zürich / CH
Opponent's representative
Dolder, Fritz
Rosenbergstrasse 6
Postfach 148
8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH
 [2015/02]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.11.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
21.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.11.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition19.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0196/18
23.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.03.2008
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
LU27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU27.03.2008
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/28]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/25]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/12]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/18]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/07]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE27.03.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/52]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/42]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/39]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2006288444  (MCCARROLL ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - YOON M S ET AL, "BARCSoySNP23: a panel of 23 selected SNPs for soybean cultivar identification", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (200703), vol. 114, no. 5, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 885 - 899, XP002490152 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-006-0487-8
 [A]  - BYRON D F ET AL, "COMPARISON OF THREE SELECTION PROCEDURES FOR DEVELOPMENT OF EARLY-MATURING SOYBEAN LINES", CROP SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0011-183X, pages 656 - 660, XP008094848 [A] 11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - YAMANAKA NAOKI ET AL, "Quantitative trait locus analysis of flowering time in soybean using a RFLP linkage map", BREEDING SCIENCE, (200006), vol. 50, no. 2, ISSN 1344-7610, pages 109 - 115, XP008094834 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SONG Q J ET AL, "A selected set of trinucleotide simple sequence repeat markers for soybean cultivar identification", PLANT VARIETIES AND SEEDS, (199912), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 0952-3863, pages 207 - 220, XP008094814 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - RAFALSKI ANTONI, "Applications of single nucleotide polymorphisms in crop genetics", CURRENT OPINION IN PLANT BIOLOGY, QUADRANT SUBSCRIPTION SERVICES, GB, (20020401), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1369-5266, pages 94 - 100, XP002461519 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-5266(02)00240-6
 [A]  - MANSUR L M ET AL, "DETERMINING THE LINKAGE OF QUANTITATIVE TRAIT LOCI TO RFLP MARKERS MAX L. MERR.). USING EXTREME PHENOTYPES OF RECOMBINANT INBREDS OF SOYBEAN (GLYCINE", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19930101), vol. 86, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 914 - 918, XP002910354 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LEE S H ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF QUANTITATIVE TRAIT LOCI FOR PLANT HEIGHT, LODGING, AND MATURITY IN A SOYBEAN POPULATION SEGREGATING FOR GROWTH HABIT", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19960101), vol. 92, no. 5, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 516 - 523, XP008036819 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001220050158
 [A]  - ZHANG W-K ET AL, "QTL mapping of ten agronomic traits on the soybean (Glycine max L. Merr.) genetic map and their association with EST markers", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20040401), vol. 108, no. 6, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 1131 - 1139, XP002310709 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MANSUR L M ET AL, "GENETIC MAPPING OF AGRONOMIC TRAITS USING RECOMBINANT INBRED LINES OF SOYBEAN", CROP SCIENCE, CROP SCIENCE SOCIETY OF AMERICA, MADISON, WI, US, (19960901), vol. 36, ISSN 0011-183X, pages 1327 - 1336, XP002070786 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MOLNAR STEPHEN J ET AL, "Simple sequence repeat (SSR) markers linked to E1, E3, E4, and E7 maturity genes in soybean.", GENOME, (200312), vol. 46, no. 6, ISSN 0831-2796, pages 1024 - 1036, XP002490155 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/g03-079
 [A]  - MCBLAIN B A ET AL, "A PROCEDURE TO IDENTIFY GENES AFFECTING MATURITY USING SOYBEAN ISOLINE TESTERS", CROP SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 0011-183X, pages 1127 - 1132, XP008094862 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2006042527
 EP0144914
 US4582789
 US4563417
 EP0119448
 US7154021
 US5545545
 EP0640141
 US6031154
 US6486383
 EP0797673
 US6774284
 US6140085
 US5637785
 US5952544
 US2006156435
 WO2005021761
 US2004172682
 US7067722
 US2004006792
 US5955329
 US5723761
 US5955650
 US6331664
 US6184440
 US7002058
 US4992375
 US5015580
 US5024944
 US5416011
    - SINCLAIR; BACKMAN, Compendium of Soybean Diseases, APS PRESS, page 106,
    - GARNER; ALLARD, J AGRIC. RES., (1920), vol. 18, pages 553 - 606,
    - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning, A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR PRESS,
    - HAYMES ET AL., Nucleic Acid Hybridization, A Practical Approach, IRL PRESS,
    - KANEHISA, NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 203 - 213,
    - WETMUR; DAVIDSON, J MOL. BIOL., (1968), vol. 31, pages 349 - 370,
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6,
    - PROBER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 238, pages 336 - 340,
    - MANSUR, CROP SCI., (1996), vol. 36, pages 1327 - 1336,
    - SHOEMAKER ET AL., GENETICS, (1996), vol. 144, pages 329 - 338,
    - SHOEMAKER ET AL., CROP SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 32, pages 1091 - 1098,
    - SHOEMAKER ET AL., CROP SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 35, pages 436 - 446,
    - TINLEY; RAFALSKI, J CELL BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 14E, page 291,
    - CREGAN ET AL., CROP SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 39, pages 1464 - 1490,
    - MANSUR, CROP SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 36, pages 1327 - 1336,
    - CREGAN, CROP SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 39, pages 1464 - 1490,
    - YAKLICH ET AL., CROP SCI, (2002), vol. 42, pages 1504 - 1515,
    - PIPER; BOOTE, J. AM. OIL CHEM. SOC., (1999), vol. 76, pages 1233 - 124,
    - SPECHT ET AL., CROP SCI, (2001), vol. 41, pages 493 - 509,
    - CLEMENTE, CROP SCI., (2000), vol. 40, pages 797 - 803,
    - "Vitro Selection and Culture-induced Variation in Soybean", WIDHOLM, Soybean: Genetics, Molecular Biology and Biotechnology,
    - CARTHA ET AL., CAN. J BOT., (1981), vol. 59, pages 1671 - 1679,
    - CAMEYA ET AL., PLANT SCIENCE LETTERS, (1981), vol. 21, pages 289 - 294,
    - SAKA ET AL., PLANT SCIENCE LETTERS, (1980), vol. 19, pages 193 - 201,
    - CHENG, PLANT SCIENCE LETTERS, (1980), vol. 19, pages 91 - 99,
    - RANCH ET AL., IN VITRO CELLULAR & DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (1985), vol. 21, pages 653 - 658,
    - BARWALE ET AL., PLANTA, (1986), vol. 167, pages 473 - 481,
    - WRIGHT ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1986), vol. 5, pages 150 - 154,
    - POEHLMAN; SLEPER, Breeding Field Crops, IOWA STATE UNIVERSITY PRESS,
    - FEHR, PRINCIPLES OF CULTIVAR DEVELOPMENT, (1987), vol. 1, pages 2 - 3,