EP2154109 - GRAPHITE FILM AND GRAPHITE COMPOSITE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [2018/38] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTA, Yusuke 5-5-31-404, Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 02 /
WAKAHARA, Shuhei 10-22-104 Shodokoro-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0064 / JP | 03 /
NISHIKAWA, Yasushi 1-15-302 Matsubara-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0086 / JP | [2010/13] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
OHTA, Yusuke 5-5-31 Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
WAKAHARA, Shuhei 10-22-104 Shodokoro-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0064 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIKAWA, Yasushi 1-15-302 Matsubara-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka 569-0086 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2010/07] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08752770.1 | 15.05.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008JP58910 | Priority number, date | JP20070132120 | 17.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007132120 | [2010/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008143120 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2154109 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2154109 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/20, B32B5/18, B32B7/12, B32B27/06, B32B27/28, C09K5/14, H01L23/373, H05K7/20, B32B9/00, B32B9/04 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
C09K5/14 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/20 (KR);
B32B27/065 (EP,US);
B32B27/281 (EP,US);
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B32B9/007 (EP,US);
B32B9/04 (KR);
B32B9/045 (EP,US);
C01B32/205 (EP,US);
H01L23/373 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/3737 (EP,KR,US);
H05K7/20481 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/302 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2307/714 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24446 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2918 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/39] | C01B31/04, B32B9/00, C09K5/14, H01L23/373, B32B9/04, H05K7/20 | ||
Former IPC [2010/07] | C01B31/04, B32B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/38] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Graphitfilm und Graphitkompositfilm | [2018/29] | English: | GRAPHITE FILM AND GRAPHITE COMPOSITE FILM | [2010/07] | French: | FILM DE GRAPHITE ET FILM DE GRAPHITE COMPOSITE | [2010/07] |
Former [2010/07] | GRAPHITFILM UND GRAPHITVERBUNDFILM | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2009 | Translation filed | 01.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 24.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2008 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | ES | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | IE | 15.05.2019 | LU | 15.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.05.2008 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
IE | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 15.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2007031237 ; | [A]JP2005314168 ; | [A]JP2002308611 ; | [A]US3483019 (YOUSE EARL L) [A] 1-7 * column I, line 30 - column III, line 51 *; | [X] - HISHIYAMA Y ET AL, "Graphitization behavior of carbon film prepared from high modulus polyimide film: Synthesis of high-quality graphite film", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 32, no. 4, doi:10.1016/0008-6223(94)90085-X, ISSN 0008-6223, (19940101), pages 645 - 650, (19940101), XP024030926 [X] 1-7 * column I, line 1 - column IV, line 20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6223(94)90085-X | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 25, Database accession no. 2007-246421, XP002711140 & JP2007031237 A 20070208 (KANEKA CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 81, Database accession no. 2005-790306, XP002711141 & JP2005314168 A 20051110 (KANEKA CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 07, Database accession no. 2003-071803, XP002711142 & JP2002308611 A 20021023 (UBE IND LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH07109171 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2002308611 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2005314168 (KANEKA CORP); | [A]JP2007031237 (KANEKA CORP) | by applicant | JPS61275116 | JPH02103478 | JPH06134917 | JPH1158591 | JP2003168882 |