|
02.11.2020 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2020 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2020 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
16.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2019 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
93 |
|
10.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2019 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Opposition |
27 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
24.07.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Description |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.04.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.11.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.09.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.05.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.10.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.01.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |