EP2148818 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO BEVERAGE PREPARATION MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Douwe Egberts B.V. Vleutensevaart 35 3532 AD Utrecht / NL | [2016/19] |
Former [2010/05] | For all designated states Kraft Foods R & D, Inc. Zweigniederlassung München Bayerwaldstrasse 8 81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANNER, Roger Geoffrey 11 Frensham Close Banbury Oxfordshire OX16 1FQ / GB | 02 /
HALLIDAY, Andrew Michael 7 Brassey Close Chipping Norton Oxfordshire OX7 5AS / GB | [2010/05] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2010/05] | Bucks, Teresa Anne Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08755643.7 | 16.05.2008 | [2010/05] | WO2008US63832 | Priority number, date | GB20070009589 | 18.05.2007 Original published format: GB 0709589 | US20070940118P | 25.05.2007 Original published format: US 940118 P | [2010/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008144470 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2148818 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/42, A47J31/06 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
A47J31/0673 (EP,US);
B65B43/42 (KR);
A47J31/3695 (EP,GB,US);
A47J31/06 (KR);
A47J31/40 (KR);
A47J31/407 (EP,GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/05] | B65B43/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/05] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ODER IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT GETRÄNKEZUBEREITUNGSMASCHINEN | [2010/05] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO BEVERAGE PREPARATION MACHINES | [2010/05] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES À DES MACHINES DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS OU ASSOCIÉES À DE TELLES MACHINES | [2010/05] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 26.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 23.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004191372 (HALLIDAY ANDREW [GB], et al); | [A]EP1518484 (MARS INC [US]) | International search | [X]US2004191372 (HALLIDAY ANDREW [GB], et al) |