EP2164770 - PRESTRETCHED FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Combipac BV Bruchterweg 88 7772 BJ Hardenberg / NL | [2010/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUYGHE, Michael Bruchterweg 88 NL-7772 BJ Hardenberg / NL | [2010/12] | Representative(s) | Michalík, Andrej De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2016/13] |
Former [2010/12] | Michalík, Andrej De Clercq Brants & Partners c.v. Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a B-9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 08759310.9 | 20.06.2008 | [2010/12] | WO2008EP04996 | Priority number, date | BE20070000313 | 21.06.2007 Original published format: BE 200700313 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008155129 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2164770 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2164770 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2164770 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/06 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
B65D71/08 (EP);
B65D85/07 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 20.01.2010 | BA | 20.01.2010 | MK | 20.01.2010 | RS | 20.01.2010 | Title | German: | VORGESTRECKTE FOLIE | [2010/12] | English: | PRESTRETCHED FILM | [2010/12] | French: | FILM PRÉ-ÉTIRÉ | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 17.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Observations by third parties | 11.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2016
02.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE RKW SE Nachtweideweg 1-7 67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative Busch, Tobias, et al, et al PatentHubble Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Busch & Kollegen Schlossergasse 4 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02
30.12.2016
25.04.2017
WITHDRAWN Trioplast AB P.O. Box 143 333 00 Smålandsstenar / SE Opponent's representative AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2016
02.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE RKW SE Nachtweideweg 1-7 67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative Busch, Tobias, et al, et al Anwaltskanzlei Busch & Kollegen Schlossergasse 4 67227 Frankenthal / DE | ||
02
30.12.2016
25.04.2017
WITHDRAWN Trioplast AB P.O. Box 143 333 00 Smålandsstenar / SE Opponent's representative Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | |||
Former [2017/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2016
02.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE RKW SE Nachtweideweg 1-7 67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative Busch, Tobias, et al, et al Anwaltskanzlei Busch & Kollegen Schlossergasse 4 67227 Frankenthal / DE | ||
02
30.12.2016
WITHDRAWN Trioplast AB P.O. Box 143 333 00 Smålandsstenar / SE Opponent's representative Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | |||
Former [2017/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2016
ADMISSIBLE RKW SE Nachtweideweg 1-7 67227 Frankenthal / DE Opponent's representative Busch, Tobias, et al, et al Anwaltskanzlei Busch & Kollegen Schlossergasse 4 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 03.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.06.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.01.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.05.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.08.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 28.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T0920/19 | 07.05.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2008 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | HR | 30.03.2016 | |
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO2007010341 (BEMA SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-11,14 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 6 * * page 3, line 2 - line 11 * [A] 13 [Y] 15; | [XA]EP0653352 (BURTECH AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * page 1, line 1 - line 22 * * page 3, line 5 - line 15 * [A] 15; | [Y]WO9826648 (ORPEN KENNETH STEPHEN EDDIN [GB]) [Y] 15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4131916 (KARL DICKEL & CO KG, 4100 DUISBURG, DE) [A] * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 28 *; | [A]GB2063809 (LANCASTER W G, et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5296580 (MATSUNAGA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] * column 1, line 10 - line 36 * * column 3, line 44 - line 57 * * column 4, line 43 - line 49; table 1 * | other | WO2007010341 | EP0653352 | - "OVERVIEW OF LOW DENSITY POLYETHYLENE (LDPE), EXTRUSION GRADE", DATA SHEET PLASTIFAB, URL: HTTP://WWW.PLASTIFAB.CA/A-UPLOAD-PDFS/13_01.PDF, XP003035320 | - DATA SHEET DOWLEX 2045 'POLYETHYLENE RESIN' DOW PLASTICS, pages 1 - 3, URL: HTTP://CATALOG.IDES.COM/DOCSELECT.ASPX?I=38903&E=7112&DOC=DOWTDS&DS=123&DK=STD&DC=EN, XP003035338 | Opposition | WO2007010341 | EP0653352 | WO9826648 | DE4131916 | GB2063809 | US5296580 | DE69604558T | EP0781651 | EP1015228 | EP1177131 | DE102006044041 | EP0614810 | WO9850219 | US2005170194 | GB2348633 | EP0531021 | US5797240 | EP0781651 | EP1015228 | EP1177131 | WO2009040129 | - U FRITZ, "Netzbindung und Folienbindung", Lohnunternehmen, (19850500), vol. 40, XP055336129 | - Fritz U, "Netzbindung und Folienbindung", Lohnunternehmen, (19850501), vol. 40, XP055336129 | - Technical datasheet Dowlex ™ 2045 Polyethylene Resin March 2008 | - Information about Highlight Industries Laboratory Test Equipment including information about Highlight's Stretch Film Test Stand; copyright 2011; showing the following url: http://highlightindustries.com/lab-test-equipment.html | - Test reports on Highlight's stretch film test stand | - "Technical data sheet Hand Stretch Film (Ergis-Eurofilms)", URL: http://www.drotex.sk/technicke/nanoERGIS12mic_ruc.pdf | - "Technical data sheet nanoERGIS Hand Stretch Film (Ergis-Eurofilms)", URL: http://www.drotex.sk/technicke/nanoERGIS17mic_ruc.pdf | - "Information about Stretch Wrap Film Supplies (Borst Packaging Systems BV)", URL: http://www.borstsystems.com/en/stretch-wrap-film/ | - "Baletite leaflet", URL: http://www.silotite.com/product/baletite | - Krone, Film Tying; dated November 24, 2015 | - "Information about McHale Fusion 3 Plus Baler & Wrapper", URL: http://www.showmeshortline.com/assets/mchale-fusion-3-plus-operators-manual-clt00491_rev2.pdf | - SPCR 063: Certification rules for P-marking of Agri-stretch film for round-bale ensiling (SP Technical Research Institute of Sweden); February 2008 |