EP2147429 - Personality-based device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/04] | PERSONALITY-BASED DEVICE | ||
[2013/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEEGAN, Hugh A. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
BADGER, Eric N. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
LINERUD, Drew E. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2013/32] |
Former [2010/04] | 01 /
TEEGAN, Hugh A. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
BADGER, Eric N. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
LINERUD, Drew E. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/04] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08769518.5 | 19.05.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008US64151 | Priority number, date | US20070752989 | 24.05.2007 Original published format: US 752989 | [2010/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008147755 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147429 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2147429 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/033, // G10L21/013 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
G10L13/033 (EP,KR,US);
G10L13/02 (KR);
G10L21/003 (KR);
G10L2021/0135 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/04] | G10L13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | Persönlichkeitsbasierte Vorrichtung | [2013/29] | English: | Personality-based device | [2013/29] | French: | Dispositif basé sur la personnalité | [2013/29] |
Former [2010/04] | PERSÖNLICHKEITSBASIERTE VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2010/04] | PERSONALITY-BASED DEVICE | ||
Former [2010/04] | DISPOSITIF BASÉ SUR LA PERSONNALITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 06.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2008 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BE | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | ES | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | HR | 01.01.2014 | IT | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | MT | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SE | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | NO | 01.04.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | IE | 19.05.2014 | LU | 19.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.05.2008 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
IT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
NO | 01.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
MT | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
IE | 19.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
LU | 19.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
HR | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
ES | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
SE | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1271469 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0034] , [0045] , [0046] *; | [X]US2006173911 (LEVIN BRUCE J [US], et al) [X] 7-15* paragraphs [0002] , [0034] * | International search | [X]US2002120450 (JUNQUA JEAN-CLAUDE [US], et al); | [A]JP2003337592 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]WO2004032112 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]US2004098266 (HUGHES NATHAN RAYMOND [US], et al) |