EP2152839 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION WITH HYDROPHILIZING SOIL-RELEASE AGENT AND METHODS FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay USA Inc. 8 Cedar Brook Drive Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US | [2014/08] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Rhodia, Inc. 8 Cedar Brook Drive Cranbury, NJ 08512-7500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÜTTERER, Tobias, Johannes 45 Mandalay Road 13-02 Mandale Heights Singapore 308225 / SG | 02 /
HOUGH, Lawrence, Alan 1521 N. 2nd Street Philadelphia, PA 19123 / US | 03 /
REIERSON, Robert, Lee 1 Ruthies Run Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | [2018/46] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
FÜTTERER, Tobias, Johannes 45 Mandalay Road, 13-02 Mandale Heights Singapore 308225 / SG | ||
02 /
HOUGH, Lawrence, Alan 1521 N. 2nd Street Philadelphia, PA 19123 / US | |||
03 /
REIERSON, Robert, Lee 1 Ruthies Run Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | |||
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
FÜTTERER, Tobias, Johannes 45 Mandalay Road, 13-02 Mandale Heights Singapore 308225 / SG | ||
02 /
HOUGH, Lawrence, Alan 1040 N. 2nd Street, 203 Philadelphia, PA 19123 / US | |||
03 /
REIERSON, Robert, Lee 1 Ruthies Run Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [2018/46] |
Former [2010/07] | Mancini, Vincenzo Giambrocono & C. s.p.a., Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08770846.7 | 12.06.2008 | [2010/07] | WO2008US66716 | Priority number, date | US20070943479P | 12.06.2007 Original published format: US 943479 P | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008154633 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2152839 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2152839 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D3/30, C11D1/34, C11D3/36, C11D3/37, C11D11/00 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
C11D3/0036 (EP,US);
C11D1/342 (EP,US);
C11D1/345 (EP,US);
C11D3/361 (EP,US);
C11D3/362 (EP,US);
C11D3/3784 (EP,US);
C11D2111/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | C11D1/62, C11D3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT SCHMUTZLÖSENDEN HYDROPHILIERUNGSMITTELN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2010/07] | English: | DETERGENT COMPOSITION WITH HYDROPHILIZING SOIL-RELEASE AGENT AND METHODS FOR USING SAME | [2010/07] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LESSIVE AVEC AGENT ANTISALISSURE D'HYDROPHILISATION ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 04.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2018 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 13.04.2018 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 16.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2008 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MT | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | GB | 12.06.2019 | IE | 12.06.2019 | LU | 12.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | FR | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 12.06.2008 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 12.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 12.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 12.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
FR | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 12.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
GB | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
IE | 12.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1515792 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * page 2, line 41; examples 3,4; claim - * [I] 5,9,11; | [I]DE3531128 (HOFFMANN STAERKEFABRIKEN AG) [I] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [I]US5334325 (CHAUSSEE JAMES G [US]) [I] 1-11 * column 1, lines 9-13 * * column 1, lines 50-64 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 16 * * example -; claim - *; | [XI]DE19954830 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 6, lines 18-21 * * page 8, lines 48-54 * * example -; claim - * [I] 5,9-11; | [I]WO2006005721 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-11 * page 8, lines 29-32 * * page 9, lines 20-22 ** example -; claim - * | International search | [XY]US3956198 (BAUER HENRY) [X] 1-4, 6-8, 10, 11 * See abstract; column 2, line 1-column 4, line 11; claims 1-18 * [Y] 5, 9; | [A]US4049558 (RASMUSSEN HJORTH) [A] 1-11* See the whole document *; | [XY]US4836949 (KLAJNSCEK LESLIE J [CA]) [X] 1-4, 6-8, 10, 11 * See abstract; column 2, lines 29-52; column 4, line 1-column 5, line 12; example 1; claims 1,6 * [Y] 5, 9; | [YA]GB2283755 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 9 * See abstract; pages 3-5, 9-10, 15-17; claims 1-17 * [A] 1-8, 10, 11; | [YA]WO9742288 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 5 * See abstract; claims 1, 5 * [A] 1-4, 6-11 | by applicant | US2874074 | US3033704 | US3332880 | GB1082179 | US3598865 | US3681241 | US3717630 | GB1314897 | US3912681 | US3948838 | US3956198 | FR2334698 | GB1498520 | GB1515792 | US4127489 | GB1537288 | US4144226 | DE2829022 | US4235735 | US4246495 | JPS57161170 | US4483779 | EP0132043 | EP0132046 | US4536318 | US4536317 | US4536319 | US4565647 | DE3531128 | US4836949 | US4976879 | US5334325 | JPH06313271 | US5405542 | US5415807 | GB2283755 | WO9532272 | WO9532997 | US5510042 | WO9742288 | WO9839401 | DE19954830 | WO2006005721 | US19960726437 | US20060812819 | US20060842265 |