EP2167316 - MULTILAYER FILM STRUCTURES COMPRISING BIO-BASED MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states E. I. Du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARBONNEL, Lucie 922, Rue du Jura Domaines des Roches F-01170 Cessy / FR | 02 /
HAUSMANN, Karlheinz Abbesses 21 CH-2012 Auvernier / CH | 03 /
LEE, I-Hwa 4407 Tennyson Road Wilmington, DE 19802 / US | 04 /
THOMI, Cedric 28, Chemin des Grands-Bussions CH-1233 Sezenove / CH | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Morf, Jan Stefan Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08772335.9 | 02.07.2008 | [2010/13] | WO2008US68970 | Priority number, date | US20070947767P | 03.07.2007 Original published format: US 947767 P | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009006503 | Date: | 08.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2167316 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B27/32, B32B27/36, B65D65/40 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/06 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2307/5825 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7163 (EP,US);
B32B2435/00 (EP,US);
B32B2439/02 (EP,US);
B32B2439/46 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31757 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T442/678 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE FILMSTRUKTUREN MIT BIO-MATERIALIEN | [2010/13] | English: | MULTILAYER FILM STRUCTURES COMPRISING BIO-BASED MATERIALS | [2010/13] | French: | STRUCTURES À FILM MULTICOUCHE COMPRENANT DES MATÉRIAUX BIO | [2010/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/12] | 31.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007031691 (FORLONI ROBERTO [IT] ET AL) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0053] , [0062] , [0087] , [0088] , [0164] *; | [Y]JPS4935480 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1975, no. 07, Database accession no. 1975-11497W, XP002492159 & JPS4935480 A 19740402 (CHISSO CORP) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * |