|
22.11.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
01.09.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
25.07.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2022 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.05.2022 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.05.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2022 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.04.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.04.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
17 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.07.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
48 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
18 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
18 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.08.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.06.2019 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2010 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |