EP2188114 - SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION USING A PLURALITY OF MODELING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratasys Ltd. 2 Holzman Street 3rd Floor Kiryat Weizmann Science Park 76124 Rehovot / IL | [2013/12] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Objet Geometries Ltd. PO Box 2496 76124 Rehovot / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAPADENSKY, Eduardo 86 Yehuda HaLevi Street 42325 Natania / IL | 02 /
MENCHIK, Guy 42 Asher Street 43553 RaAnana / IL | 03 /
KRITCHMAN, Eliahu, M. 56 Mota Gur Street 69012 Tel-aviv / IL | 04 /
SHTILERMAN, Slava 16/5 Yirmiahu Street 71700 ModiIn / IL | 05 /
KLEINHENDLER, Chaim 35 Kisos Street 71908 Maccabim / IL | 06 /
LEVI, Moshe 3 Shalag Street 63574 Tel-Aviv / IL | 07 /
TARAN, David P.O. Box 9012 61090 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2018/37] |
Former [2012/47] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2010/21] | Fichter, Robert Arno Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 08776652.3 | 24.07.2008 | [2010/21] | WO2008IL01025 | Priority number, date | US20070935090P | 25.07.2007 Original published format: US 935090 P | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009013751 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2188114 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2188114 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/112, B29C64/393, B33Y50/02, B33Y10/00, B29C67/00, // B29C64/40 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
B29C64/393 (EP,US);
B29C64/106 (EP,US);
B29C64/112 (EP,US);
B29C64/20 (EP,US);
B29C64/268 (US);
B29C64/40 (EP,US);
B29C67/202 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2010/21] | B29C67/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEHRERE MODELLIERMATERIALIEN VERWENDENDE HERSTELLUNG EINER MASSIVEN FREIFORM | [2010/21] | English: | SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION USING A PLURALITY OF MODELING MATERIALS | [2010/21] | French: | FABRICATION EN FORME IRRÉGULIÈRE SOLIDE À L'AIDE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE MATÉRIAUX DE MODELAGE | [2010/21] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/21] | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13176069.6 / EP2664443 | EP13176072.0 / EP2664444 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.07.2008 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MT | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | PL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.07.2008 | |
AT | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 12.09.2018 | |
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
PL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6405095 (JANG BORZENG [US], et al) [X] 1-29,33-35,40-45,67-70,72,73 * abstract * * figures 1,2a,5,6a-d * * column 5, line 50 - column 9, line 11 * * column 10, line 4 - column 20, line 47 * [Y] 25-28,74; | [DXY]US2004187714 (NAPADENSKY EDUARDO [IL], et al) [DX] 76-81 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0226] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0069] * [Y] 74; | [Y]JP2004090530 (CTT CORP KK, et al) [Y] 25-28 * abstract * * figures 1,12 * | Examination | WO2004096527 | by applicant | US6259962 | US6569373 | US6658314 | US6850334 | US6863859 | US7183335 | US7209797 | US2004187714 | US2005069784 | US2005104241 | US2006054039 | US5149548 | US6508971 | US2006127153 | US2006159869 | US6989115 | US5768134 | WO2004044816 | US20000555087 | US20020430362 | WO2007IL00429 |