EP2170617 - NON-VOLATILE MEMORY DATA INTEGRITY VALIDATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2015/04] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. Legal Department, MS 35 Intellectual Property Administration 3404 E. Harmony Road Fort Collins CO 80527-2400 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMAN, Joseph, H. 18110 SE 34th St. Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Frankhuizen, Jan, et al Hewlett-Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Camí de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Sant Cugat del Vallès / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Exell, Jonathan Mark Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [2010/14] | Exell, Jonathan Mark Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08782263.1 | 23.07.2008 | [2010/14] | WO2008US70890 | Priority number, date | US20070881543 | 27.07.2007 Original published format: US 881543 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009018054 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2170617 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170617 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2170617 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | [2012/37] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP2170617 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2170617 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/393, B41J2/175 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
B41J2/17546 (EP,US);
G03G15/0863 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0697 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | B41J29/393 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VALIDIERUNG DER INTEGRITÄT VON DATEN EINES NICHT FLÜCHTIGEN SPEICHERS | [2010/14] | English: | NON-VOLATILE MEMORY DATA INTEGRITY VALIDATION | [2010/14] | French: | VALIDATION D'INTÉGRITÉ DE DONNÉES DE MÉMOIRE NON-VOLATILE | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 16.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Limitations: | 08.08.2014 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 01.12.2014 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | HR | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | LU | 23.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/39] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
LU | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
LU | 23.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | HR | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
IS | 08.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1316428 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0098] - [0100]; figures 1,4a,4b, 14, 15 *; | [X]EP1389528 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 37] , [0 40]; figures 6,7 * * paragraphs [0058] - [0060]; figures 9a, 9b *; | [X]WO2005094455 (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [X] 1,8,15* paragraphs [0028] , [0 29]; figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP1767369 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0040]; figures 9-11 * | International search | [A]US6267463 (PAULSEN RONALD R [US], et al); | [A]US2003189607 (BULLOCK MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [A]JP2007007946 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | by applicant | US6264301 | US6267463 | EP1316428 | EP1389528 | WO2005094455 | EP1767369 |