EP2182572 - FUEL CELL STACK AND FUEL CELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA Toshiyuki c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
KAMBARA Hironori c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522. / JP | 03 /
MURAOKA, Masashi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIE, Tomohisa c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08791875.1 | 30.07.2008 | [2010/18] | WO2008JP63644 | Priority number, date | JP20070202146 | 02.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007202146 | JP20080087571 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008087571 | JP20080126377 | 13.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008126377 | [2010/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009017147 | Date: | 05.02.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2182572 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24, H01M8/02, H01M8/10, H01M8/1011, H01M8/241, // H01M8/1018 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (EP,US);
H01M8/0263 (EP);
H01M8/0265 (EP);
H01M8/241 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/18] | H01M8/24, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSTAPEL UND BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM | [2010/18] | English: | FUEL CELL STACK AND FUEL CELL SYSTEM | [2010/18] | French: | EMPILEMENT DE PILES À COMBUSTIBLE ET SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE | [2010/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2010 | Translation filed | 11.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 09.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2005122307 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-11,18-21 * the whole document * [A] 2 [I] 12-17; | [XAI]US2005181269 (ESHRAGHI RAY R [US], et al) [X] 1,3-11,18-21 * the whole document * [A] 2 [I] 12-17 | International search | [XA]JPS61121268 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-8, 16-19, 21-23, 29-30 * , Full text & US 4664987 A1 & EP 181680 A1 * [A] 9-15, 20, 24-28; | [XA]JPH08162141 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [X] 9-10, 12-18, 21, 29-30 * , Full text & US 5549982 A1 & EP 706229 A2 * [A] 1-8, 11, 19-20, 22-28; | [XA]JPH10134836 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 9-10, 12-18, 21, 29-30 * , Full text (Family: none) * [A] 1-8, 11, 19-20, 22-28; | [XA]JP2006222099 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 16-19, 21, 29-30 * , Full text (Family: none) * [A] 1-15, 20, 22-28; | [XA]JPH10134829 (FUJIKURA LTD) [X] 16-18, 21, 29-30 * , Full text (Family: none) * [A] 1-15, 19-20, 22-28; | [XA]JP2001283892 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 16-19, 21, 24, 29-30 * , Full text & US 2002/76597 A1 & EP 1134830 A2 * [A] 1-15, 20, 22-23, 25-28; | [A]JP2003282131 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * , Full text & US 2003/180594 A1 & EP 1349227 A2 *; | [A]JP2006172944 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-30 * , Full text (Family: none) * | by applicant | WO03067693 | JPH0541239 |