EP2186312 - ACOUSTIC ECHO CANCELLATION BASED ON NOISE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2011/09] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Motorola, Inc. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Jincheng 631 Commons Road Naperville, Illinois 60563 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Joel A. 9017 Hampstead Court Woodridge, Illinois 60517 / US | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08798672.5 | 26.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008US74281 | Priority number, date | US20070848376 | 31.08.2007 Original published format: US 848376 | [2010/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009029605 | Date: | 05.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2186312 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2186312 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M9/08 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
H04M9/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | AUF RAUSCHUMGEBUNG BASIERENDER ECHOKOMPENSATOR | [2010/20] | English: | ACOUSTIC ECHO CANCELLATION BASED ON NOISE ENVIRONMENT | [2010/20] | French: | ANNULATION D'ÉCHO ACOUSTIQUE SUR LA BASE D'UN ENVIRONNEMENT BRUYANT | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2008 | AT | 25.01.2012 | BE | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | HR | 25.01.2012 | IT | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | NO | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | ES | 06.05.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | IE | 26.08.2012 | LU | 26.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 26.08.2012 | ||
LU | 26.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 26.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 26.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IE | 26.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
ES | 06.05.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
BE | 25.01.2012 | ||
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
IT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
HR | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NO | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0884886 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 37 - line 56; figure 1 *; | [A]US5937060 (OH STEPHEN S [US]) [A] 1-20* column 4, line 11 - column 6, line 14 *; | [A]WO2006049260 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-20; | [PA]US2008101622 (SUGIYAMA AKIHIKO [JP]) [PA] 1-20 * paragraphs [0123] , [0124]; figure 3 * |