EP2269788 - A RECOMBINED BAMBOO SECTION MATERIAL AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou DASSO Bamboo Technology Co., Ltd. Xinhe Village, Linpu Town Xiaoshan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311251 / CN | [2015/01] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Dasso Industrial Group Co., Ltd. Xinhe Linpu, Xiaoshan Hangzhou City Zhejiang 311251 / CN | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Hangzhou Dazhuang Floor Co., Ltd. Youcheqiao Linpu. Xiaoshan Hangzhou City Zhejiang 311251 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Qisheng Xinhe, Linpu, Xiaoshan Hangzhou, Zhejiang, 311251 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Shenxue Xinhe, Linpu, Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Hai Xinhe, Linpu, Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | 04 /
XU, Xufeng Xinhe, Linpu, Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Hongzheng Xinhe, Linpu, Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | 06 /
XU, Bin Xinhe, Linpu, Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | 07 /
HE, Wen Xinhe, Linpu, Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | [2011/18] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
ZHANG, Qisheng Youcheqiao Linpu Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | ||
02 /
JIANG, Shenxue Youcheqiao Linpu Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | |||
03 /
LIN, Hai Youcheqiao Linpu Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | |||
04 /
XU, Xufeng Youcheqiao Linpu Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | |||
05 /
LIU, Hongzheng Youcheqiao Linpu Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | |||
06 /
XU, Bin Youcheqiao Linpu Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | |||
07 /
HE, Wen Youcheqiao Linpu Xiaoshan Hangzhou Zhejiang 311251 / CN | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08800590.5 | 09.09.2008 | [2011/01] | WO2008CN01596 | Priority number, date | CN2008193764 | 18.04.2008 Original published format: CN200810093764 | [2011/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009127092 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269788 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269788 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2269788 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/04, B27N1/00, B27N3/08 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
B27N3/04 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1056 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1062 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1064 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24314 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | REKOMBINIERTES BAMBUSSCHNITTMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/01] | English: | A RECOMBINED BAMBOO SECTION MATERIAL AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2011/01] | French: | MATÉRIAU RECOMBINÉ COMPOSÉ DE SECTIONS DE BAMBOU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2010 | Translation filed | 18.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 22.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2008 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 08.10.2014 | |
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 08.10.2014 | |
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5161591 (SEALEY ROBIN D [AU], et al)[A] 1-16; | [A]US5505238 (FUJII TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 25; figure - *; | [XYI]US5972467 (WASHO KENJI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-9,12 * column 2, lines 31-55 * * column 3, lines 1-4 * * column 4, lines 10-21,40-60 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 41 * * column 7, lines 47-52; figure - * [Y] 15 [I] 4,10,11,13,14,16; | [Y]KR20050048450 (JANG GEUM SIK [KR]) [Y] 15 * example 1 *; | [A]JP2007131746 (CHARCOAL KK) [A] 1-16; | [A]CN100999092 (NANJING UNIV OF FORESTRY [CN]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5972467 (WASHO KENJI [JP]); | [A]CN1312151 (ZHAO RENJIE [CN]); | [A]CN1401464 (XU XUEHUI [CN]); | [Y]CN1718385 (TANG JUN [CN]); | [Y]CN2825280Y (TANG JUN [CN]); | [X]CN100999092 (NANJING UNIV OF FORESTRY [CN]) |