EP2185661 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CONDUCTING POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstr. 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Heraeus Precious Metals GmbH & Co. KG Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Heraeus Clevios GmbH 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states H.C. Starck Clevios GmbH Im Schleeke 78-91 38642 Goslar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOEVENICH, Wilfried Königsberger Str. 61 51469 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
HILL, Rudolf Von Hünefeldstr. 125 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
ELSCHNER, Andreas Lederstr. 6 45479 Mühlheim / DE | 04 /
JONAS, Friedrich Krugenofen 15 52066 Aachen / DE | 05 /
GUNTERMANN, Udo Hinter Sollbrüggen 39 47800 Krefeld / DE | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstrasse 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Herzog, Martin Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstraße 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/20] | Herzog, Martin Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Immermannstrasse 59 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08803268.5 | 27.08.2008 | [2010/20] | WO2008EP61213 | Priority number, date | DE20071041722 | 04.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007041722 | [2010/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009030615 | Date: | 12.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2185661 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2185661 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/24, C09D125/18, C09D165/00, H01B1/12 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
C09D5/24 (EP,US);
H10K85/1135 (EP,US);
C09D125/18 (EP,US);
C09D165/00 (EP,US);
H01B1/127 (EP,US);
H01G11/48 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D125/18, C08L2666/22 (US,EP);
C09D165/00, C08L2666/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/16] |
Former [2010/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LEITFÄHIGEN POLYMEREN | [2010/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CONDUCTING POLYMERS | [2010/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE POLYMÈRES CONDUCTEURS | [2010/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 14.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2008 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | DK | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | HR | 15.04.2015 | IT | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | LV | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | MT | 15.04.2015 | NL | 15.04.2015 | PL | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | TR | 15.04.2015 | NO | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | AT | 27.08.2015 | GB | 27.08.2015 | IE | 27.08.2015 | LU | 27.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | FR | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
AT | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
AT | 27.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
GB | 27.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 15.04.2015 | |
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 15.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | JP2006328276 [ ] (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [XA]US2007085061 (ELDER DELWIN L [US], et al) [X] 15,16 * abstract *[A] 1-14; | [DXA] - HIGUCHI, YASUSHI ET AL, ".pi.-conjugated conductive polymer solution for coatings", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20061207), Database accession no. 2006:1279517, URL: STN, XP002504427 [DX] 15,16 * abstract * [A] 1-14 |