EP2328750 - GLASS PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166 1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUIJKX, Antoine Rue de l'Aurore 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 02 /
DADO, Carmelo Rue de l'Aurore 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | 03 /
STEFANA, Grégory Rue de l'Aurore 2 B-6040 Jumet / BE | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Bayot, Daisy, et al AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre IP Department Rue Louis Blériot, 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Bayot, Daisy, et al AGC Glass Europe S.A. R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | ||
Former [2011/23] | Verbrugge, Vivien François Emeric AGC Glass Europe Intellectual Property Department R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore, 2 6040 Jumet / BE | Application number, filing date | 08804296.5 | 17.09.2008 | [2011/23] | WO2008EP62341 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031428 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2328750 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C27/12, E06B3/67, F21V23/02 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP);
B32B17/10192 (EP);
B32B17/10211 (EP);
B32B17/10541 (EP);
H05B3/84 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | GLASSCHEIBE | [2011/23] | English: | GLASS PANEL | [2011/23] | French: | PANNEAU DE VERRE | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 23.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 17.04.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4805070 (KOONTZ HARRY S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,11,12 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0413580 (PILKINGTON PLC [GB]) [A] 1,11 * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 57 *; | [A]DE19513263 (LINDENMEIER HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1,11 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 48; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2004022058 (BIRRELL PETER CHARLES [AU]) [A] 1,6,7,11,14,15 * figure -; claim - * |