EP2147198 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DEFROSTING AN EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2010/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDILOT, Xavier 38 avenue Emile ZOLA 75015 Paris / FR | [2010/04] | Representative(s) | Ménès, Catherine PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Ménès, Catherine Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle (LG081) 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2010/04] | Ménès, Catherine Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle (LG081) 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 08805702.1 | 24.04.2008 | [2010/04] | WO2008FR50748 | Priority number, date | FR20070055184 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: FR 0755184 | [2010/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008152261 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2147198 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2147198 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N5/02 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP);
B60K13/04 (EP);
F01N5/02 (EP);
B60K2015/03427 (EP);
F01N2240/02 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F01N2610/10 (EP);
F01N2610/1406 (EP);
F01N2610/1486 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFROSTUNG EINES ABGASBEARBEITUNGSZUSATZES | [2010/04] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DEFROSTING AN EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT ADDITIVE | [2010/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DECONGELATION D'UN ADDITIF DE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2010/04] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2008 | AT | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HR | 26.10.2011 | IE | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | NO | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | LU | 24.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
LU | 24.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0138704 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 28; figure 1 *; | [DA]US2003101715 (HUTHWOHL GEORG [DE]) [DA] 1,9* abstract *; | [A]JP2006083742 (TAMA TLO KK) [A] 2,3,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006087541 (IMI VISION LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 11, line 19 - line 22; figure - *; | [A]EP1712754 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO [JP]) [A] 13 * figure 3 * | by applicant | WO0138704 |