EP2193082 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACCESSING A PERSONAL COMPUTER DEVICE ONBOARD AN AIRCRAFT AND AIRCRAFT EQUIPPED WITH SUCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus 1, Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte 31700 Blagnac / FR | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCOIS, Bruno 21 rue des Chataigniers F-31880 La Salvetat Saint Gilles / FR | 02 /
SMITH, Garrett 2 Allée du Vivarais F-31770 Colomiers / FR | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Le Tourneau, Augustin Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Le Tourneau, Augustin Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/23] | Le Tourneau, Augustin Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08838550.5 | 19.09.2008 | [2010/23] | WO2008FR51688 | Priority number, date | FR20070057913 | 27.09.2007 Original published format: FR 0757913 | [2010/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009047464 | Date: | 16.04.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2193082 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2193082 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00, G06F13/00 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
B64D11/0015 (EP,US);
B64D11/00155 (US);
B64D11/00151 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF EINEN PC AN BORD EINES FLUGZEUGS UND MIT EINEM SOLCHEN SYSTEM AUSGERÜSTETES FLUGZEUG | [2010/23] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ACCESSING A PERSONAL COMPUTER DEVICE ONBOARD AN AIRCRAFT AND AIRCRAFT EQUIPPED WITH SUCH SYSTEM | [2010/23] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR ACCEDER A UN EQUIPEMENT INFORMATIQUE PERSONNEL A BORD D'UN AERONEF, ET AERONEF COMPRENANT UN TEL SYSTEME | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 08.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2008 | AT | 27.06.2012 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | HR | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | IE | 19.09.2012 | LU | 19.09.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | NO | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | ES | 08.10.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.09.2012 | ||
LU | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | |
NO | 27.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0014987 (TENZING INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0014]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-8; | [X]US2002109647 (CRANDALL JOHN C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0020]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO03067818 (THALES SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 4, lines 3-18 * * page 5, lines 10-35 * * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [AY]DE20315554U (OESTERIE SLR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0040]; figure 6 * [Y] 5-7; | [X]US2003233659 (GUERIN JEANNE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012]; figures 1-10b; claims 1,11 *; | [AY]US2007061847 (CALLAHAN KEVIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0021] , [0016] - [0028]; figures 1,2a * [Y] 8; | [A]WO2007093984 (FTK TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] , [0015]; figure 1 *; | [AY]FR2898315 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 1, lines 3-27 * * page 5, lines 1-7 * * page 6, lines 8-18 * * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 4; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4; | [PX]US2008061609 (WILLIAMSON ROBERT V [US]) [PX] 1,9* the whole document * |