EP2217819 - LINEAR BEARING CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB SKF Hornsgatan 1 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDELMANN, Ludwig Schlangenweg 13 97717 Sulzthal / DE | 02 /
MAYER, Uwe Heideweg 27 97702 Münnerstadt / DE | 03 /
STAHL, Erwin Siebengärten 19 97714 Oerlenbach-Rottershausen / DE | 04 /
VELDE, Henryk Lärchenstrasse 21 97440 Werneck / DE | 05 /
WIESENAU, Doreen Emil - Diezel - Strasse 12 97525 Schwebheim / DE | [2010/34] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
EDELMANN, Ludwig Schlangenweg 13 97717 Sulzthal / DE | ||
02 /
MAYER, Uwe Heideweg 27 97702 Münnerstadt / DE | |||
03 /
STAHL, Erwin Siebengärten 19 97714 Oerlenbach-Rottershausen / DE | |||
04 /
VELDE, Henryk Lärchenstrasse 21 97440 Werneck / DE | |||
05 /
WIESENAU, Doreen Alter Schweinfurter Weg 22 97525 Schwebheim / DE | Representative(s) | Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Kohl, Thomas SKF GmbH Gunnar-Wester-Strasse 12 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 08850705.8 | 06.11.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008EP09368 | Priority number, date | DE20071054407 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054407 | [2010/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009062627 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2217819 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2217819 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/04, F16C33/38 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
F16C29/04 (EP);
F16C33/3856 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | LINEARWÄLZLAGERKÄFIG | [2010/33] | English: | LINEAR BEARING CAGE | [2010/33] | French: | CAGE DE ROULEMENT LINÉAIRE | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 16.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | HR | 28.09.2011 | HU | 28.09.2011 | IE | 28.09.2011 | IT | 28.09.2011 | LT | 28.09.2011 | LV | 28.09.2011 | MT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | PL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | LU | 06.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | NO | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | ES | 08.01.2012 | IS | 28.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/13] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2311815 (BRINEY JR OTTIS R) [AD] 1,5,7-16 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 57; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3582161 (HUDSON ARTHUR F) [A] 1,5-8,10-15 * column 3, line 9 - column 6, line 24; figures 1-10,14-17 *; | [A]JPH07301233 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1-5,7-16 * abstract *; | [A]EP0785367 (SCHWARZBICH JOERG [DE]) [A] 1,5,7-10,12,15,16* column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 18; figures 1-3 * |