|
17.05.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
11.05.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.05.2023 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.08.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Description |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2022 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
14.04.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2022 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
26.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.03.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.03.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.02.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
24.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
24.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
24.04.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.06.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
54 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
33 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
21.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
12.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.05.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Appeal |
18 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Appeal |
27 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Appeal |
11 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Abstract |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Description |
Appeal |
7 |