EP2215120 - HUMANIZED ANTIBODY MOLECULES SPECIFIC FOR IL-31 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | For all designated states Merck Serono S.A. 9 Chemin des Mines 1201 Geneva / CH | [2012/19] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, Washington 98102 / US | ||
For all designated states Merck Serono S.A. 9 Chemin des Mines 1201 Geneva / CH | |||
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, Washington 98102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONDENSGAARD, Kent Elmevej 4 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | 02 /
BECKMANN, Roland Zehenthofgasse 35/4 AT-Wien 1190 / AT | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | 01 /
BONDENSGAARD, Kent Elmevej 4 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | ||
02 /
BECKMANN, Roland 15 Chemin Taverney Grand-Saconnex CH-1218 Geneva / CH | Representative(s) | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Griffin, Philippa Jane, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08856113.9 | 08.12.2008 | [2010/32] | WO2008EP67024 | Priority number, date | US20070012362P | 07.12.2007 Original published format: US 12362 P | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009071696 | Date: | 11.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2215120 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/24, A61K39/395 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
C07K16/244 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00114 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/63 (US);
C12N5/10 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/51 (US);
C07K2317/515 (US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/32] | Extension states | AL | 03.06.2010 | BA | 03.06.2010 | MK | 03.06.2010 | RS | 03.06.2010 | Title | German: | FÜR IL-31 SPEZIFISCHE HUMANISIERTE ANTIKÖRPERMOLEKÜLE | [2010/32] | English: | HUMANIZED ANTIBODY MOLECULES SPECIFIC FOR IL-31 | [2010/32] | French: | MOLÉCULES D'ANTICORPS HUMANISÉS SPÉCIFIQUES POUR IL-31 | [2010/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 24.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/31] | 14.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/31] | Divisional application(s) | EP12161272.5 / EP2471817 | EP14175301.2 / EP2796466 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | Zymogenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | Date: | 21.10.2011 | [2012/10] | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006188500 (LEUNG DONALD Y [US], et al); | [XI]WO2006122079 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al); | [XPL]WO2008028192 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2006122079 | WO2008028192 |