|
12.12.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.11.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
28.10.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2016 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
27 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
114 |
|
15.12.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.2010 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.04.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
22 |
|
11.12.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |