EP2336833 - ADJUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2013/24] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08877286.8 | 10.10.2008 | [2011/25] | WO2008JP68499 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010041338 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2336833 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2336833 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G05B11/36, G05B11/42 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
G05B11/42 (EP,US);
G05B11/36 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | G05B11/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | JUSTIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/25] | English: | ADJUSTER | [2011/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2011 | Translation filed | 01.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2008 | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | HR | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | MT | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | NO | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | GB | 10.10.2013 | IE | 10.10.2013 | LU | 10.10.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | FR | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 10.10.2008 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 10.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.10.2013 | ||
LU | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 10.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 10.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 10.10.2013 | ||
IE | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
FR | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3938017 (HAYES THOMAS EDWARD) [A] 1-14 * column 2, lines 18-60 *; | [A]US4268784 (GANAWAY FRANKLIN D) [A] 1-14* column 1, line 18 - column 3, line 16 *; | [A]US4303873 (HAWKINS ROYAL R) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0406836 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 1 - page 5 * | International search | [A]JPH02213902 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH07219601 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2531796B (TOSHIBA CORP.); | [A]JP2000155602 (RKC INSTRUMENTS INC); | [Y]JP2004086858 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JP2004206515 (RKC INSTRUMENTS INC) | by applicant | JP2531796B |