EP2363329 - HYBRID VEHICLE AND HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/33] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2011/36] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Junichi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2011/36] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/36] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08877961.6 | 05.11.2008 | [2018/33] | WO2008JP70092 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010052766 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2363329 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2363329 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, B60W10/26, B60L3/00, B60W20/00, H01M10/48, H01M10/44, H02J7/14, // B60K6/445 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
H02J7/007194 (EP,US);
B60L58/15 (EP,US);
B60L58/24 (EP,US);
B60L58/25 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (US);
B60W10/08 (US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/13 (US);
H01M10/443 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
H02J7/14 (EP);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2510/246 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/36] | B60W10/26, B60L3/00, B60W20/00, H01M10/48, H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDFAHRZEUG UND HYBRIDFAHRZEUGSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2011/36] | English: | HYBRID VEHICLE AND HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL METHOD | [2011/36] | French: | VÉHICULE HYBRIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | [2011/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2011 | Translation filed | 03.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2008 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | PT | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | IE | 05.11.2018 | LU | 05.11.2018 | MT | 05.11.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 05.11.2008 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PT | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
MT | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
IE | 05.11.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
LU | 05.11.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7053588 (NAKANISHI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 6 - line 47; figures 1-3 * * column 7, line 13 - column 13, line 51 *; | [A]WO2007119820 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]JP2008207578 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1,9-12 ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0044] *; | [E]EP2009762 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]JP2005124353 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2006262634 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2006257895 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]WO2008111593 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2006101674 |