EP2365904 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A TIRE COMPONENT UPON AN AXIALLY TAPERED SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 12 Cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states MICHELIN Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | ||
For all designated states Société de Technologie MICHELIN 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REY, Daniel 26 S. Cedarbluff Court Greer, South Carolina 29650 / US | 02 /
SATTERFIELD, Larry 123 Sunset Lane Moore South Carolina 29369 / US | [2011/38] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2014/07] |
Former [2011/38] | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08878194.3 | 05.12.2008 | WO2008US85732 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010065042 | Date: | 10.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2365904 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2365904 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/16, B29D30/72 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
B29D30/16 (EP,US);
B29D30/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER REIFENKOMPONENTE AUF EINER SICH AXIAL VERJÜNGENDEN FLÄCHE | [2011/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A TIRE COMPONENT UPON AN AXIALLY TAPERED SURFACE | [2011/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FORMER UN COMPOSANT DE PNEUMATIQUE SUR UNE SURFACE CONIQUE AXIALEMENT | [2011/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2008 | AT | 12.02.2014 | BE | 12.02.2014 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | ES | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | NL | 12.02.2014 | PL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | SE | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | TR | 12.02.2014 | NO | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.12.2008 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
TR | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1016279 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]) [A] 1,11,12,14,19,20,24-27 * page 2, line 108 - page 6, line 26; figures 1-8 *; | [XI]US3595724 (LEBLOND JEAN) [X] 1-3,6-9,11,14-16,18,22 * column 4, line 38 - line 43; figures 4-6,8,18-21 * * column 3, line 47 - line 49; figures 12,12a,14 * * column 3, line 41 - line 46; figures 12,20,21 * * column 4, line 38 - line 53; figures 4,5,18-21 * [I] 4,5,10,12,13,17,19-21,23-27; | [X]US4222810 (YTTERSTROEM GUNNAR E) [X] 1,14 * column 2, line 8 - column 7, line 22; figures 1-8 *; | [X]EP0340147 (APSLEY METALS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,14 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 1; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0419050 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-8,14-18 * column 2, line 54 - column 6, line 54; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0429286 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-8,14-18 * column 4, line 3 - column 9, line 42; figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE19823433 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1,14 * column 10, line 7 - column 12, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1486320 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11,12,14,19,20,24-27* paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004]; figure 2 *; | [X]DE102005046115 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1,14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]EP1977876 (TECHNOLOGIE MICHELIN S A SOC D [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-4 * |