EP2358491 - CUTTING INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taegutec. Ltd. 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalsung-gun, Daegu-si 711-860 / KR | [2011/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Hong Sik C/O TaeguTec LTD 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalsung-gun Daegu 711-860 / KR | 02 /
JOO, Jang Hyuk C/O TaeguTec LTD 304 Yonggye-ri Gachang-myeon Dalsung-gun Daegu 711-860 / KR | [2011/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08878290.9 | 21.11.2008 | [2011/34] | WO2008KR06900 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010058870 | Date: | 27.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2358491 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/16, B23C5/20 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
B23B27/141 (EP,US);
B23B2200/086 (EP,US);
B23B2222/36 (EP,US);
B23B2222/80 (EP,US);
B23B2250/12 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US);
Y10T82/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEINSATZ | [2011/34] | English: | CUTTING INSERT | [2011/34] | French: | INSERT DE COUPE | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 05.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 21.06.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2011 | 30.11.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0693012 (SANDVIK AB [SE]); | [Y]WO2007104275 (KENNAMETAL WIDIA PROD GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]EP0534494 (GTE VALENITE CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0730925 (VALENITE INC [US]) |