EP2076036 - Advertisement in an end-user controlled playback environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NDS Limited One London Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 4EX / GB | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wachtfogel, Reuven NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 02 /
Maissel, Jonathan NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 03 /
Kranc, Moshe NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 04 /
Richardson, David NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 05 /
Katz, Ron NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 06 /
Tsuria, Yossi NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 07 /
Michelson, Sam NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 08 /
Krause, Mika NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 09 /
Epstein, Steve NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 10 /
Shlissel, Moshe NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 11 /
Handelman, Doron NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 12 /
Kipnis, Shlomo NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | 13 /
Shen-Orr, Chaim NDS Technologies Israel Ltd., P.O. Box 23013 Jerusalem 91235 / IL | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09002794.7 | 14.01.2001 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | US20000176215 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: US 176215 | US20000179968 | 03.02.2000 Original published format: US 179968 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2076036 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N21/23424 (EP,US);
H04N21/25435 (EP,US);
H04N21/2547 (EP,US);
H04N21/25883 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4333 (EP,US);
H04N21/4353 (EP,US);
H04N21/44016 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N21/47815 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | Werbung in einer endbenutzergesteuerten Wiedergabeumgebung | [2009/27] | English: | Advertisement in an end-user controlled playback environment | [2009/27] | French: | Publicité dans un environnement de lecture contrôlé par un utilisateur final | [2009/27] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 12.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01900610.5 / EP1169858 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010900610) is 26.02.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5414773 | US5715315 | WO9901984 | WO0001149 | IL121230 | US20000515118 |