Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2226707

EP2226707 - Adaptive pointing - implicit gain adaptation for absolute pointing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universität Konstanz
Universitätsstrasse 10
78464 Konstanz / DE
[2010/36]
Inventor(s)01 / König, Werner
Weidenweg 2
88348 Bad Saulgau / DE
02 / Reiterer, Harald
Hornwiesenstrasse 7
78465 Konstanz-Dingelsdorf / DE
03 / Gerken, Jens
Hindenburgstrasse 18
78467 Konstanz / DE
 [2012/32]
Former [2010/36]01 / König, Werner
Weidenweg 2
88348 Bad Saulgau / DE
02 / Reiterer, Harald, Prof.
Hornwiesenstrasse 7
78465 Konstanz-Dingelsdorf / DE
03 / Gerken, Jens
Hindenburgstrasse 18
78467 Konstanz / DE
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/02]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2010/36]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date09003304.406.03.2009
[2010/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2226707
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2226707
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/038, G06F3/042
[2010/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/36]
TitleGerman:Adaptives Zeigen - implizite Zuwachsanpassung für absolute Zeigevorrichtungen[2010/36]
English:Adaptive pointing - implicit gain adaptation for absolute pointing devices[2010/36]
French:Pointage adaptif - Adaptation implicite du gain pour appareil de pointage absolu[2012/31]
Former [2010/36]Adaptation de gain implicite pointage adaptatif pour dispositifs de pointage absolu
Examination procedure08.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/16]
23.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2012Fee for grant paid
29.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2011
Opposition(s)10.10.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.03.2009
AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MK09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
IE06.03.2013
LU06.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
BG09.04.2013
GB09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MK09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
TR09.01.2013
IE06.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
BG09.04.2013
GB09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2014/32]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
MT09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
IE06.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
BG09.04.2013
GB09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2014/09]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
IE06.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
BG09.04.2013
GB09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2014/08]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
IE06.03.2013
CH31.03.2013
LI31.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2014/07]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
IE06.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
FR02.04.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
IT09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CY09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
CZ09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
RO09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
SK09.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
DK09.01.2013
EE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/47]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
MC31.03.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/41]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
HR09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
PT09.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
LV09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
FI09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
NL09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
GR10.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT09.01.2013
BE09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
PL09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
ES20.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE09.01.2013
LT09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT09.01.2013
SE09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
BG09.04.2013
NO09.04.2013
IS09.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT09.01.2013
SI09.01.2013
NO09.04.2013
Former [2013/26]SI09.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006073438  (PAGE DAVID W [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0048] - [0051] *;
 [X]  - JIANG ET AL, "Improving Awareness with Remote Control Point Movement Prediction in Real-Time Collaborative Graphics Editing Systems", IJCSNS INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER SCIENCE AND NETWORK SECURITY, vol. 6, no. 3A, (200603), pages 203 - 207, URL: http://paper.ijcsns.org/07_book/200603/200603A29.pdf, (20090803), XP002539680 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] *
 [A]  - FREES ET AL, "PRISM Interaction for Enhancing Control in Immersive Virtual Environments", ACM Transactions on Computer-Human Interaction ACM USA, (200705), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 1073-0516, pages 1 - 31, XP002539681 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [03.1] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1229855.1229857
 [A]  - CASIEZ G ET AL, "The impact of control-display gain on user performance in pointing tasks", HUMAN-COMPUTER INTERACTION, LAWRENCE ERLBAUM ASSOCIATES, HILLSDALE, NJ, US, (20080701), vol. 23, no. 3, ISSN 0737-0024, pages 215 - 250, XP008108696 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [02.4] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/07370020802279163
by applicant   - MYERS ET AL., "Interacting at a distance: measuring the performance of laser pointers and other devices", PROC. CHI '02, (2002), pages 33 - 40
    - VOGEL ET AL., "Distant freehand pointing and clicking on very large, high resolution displays", PROC. UIST '05, (2005), pages 33 - 42
    - M. C. CHEN ET AL., "What can a mouse curser tell us more?: correlation of eye/mouse movements on web browsing", PROC. CHI '01, (2001), pages 281 - 282
    - P. FROLOV ET AL., "Using kalman filter for natural hand tremor smoothing during the interaction with the projection screen", WORKSHOP PROCEEDINGS VEONPC '2002, (2002), pages 94 - 101