|
23.02.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2023 |
Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2023 |
Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2023 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.02.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.11.2022 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2022 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
38 |
|
25.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2022 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.08.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.07.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2022 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2022 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.08.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.08.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.07.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2021 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.06.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.06.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.06.2021 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
22 |
|
17.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.06.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.06.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
11.06.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.05.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
39 |
|
28.05.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
26 |
|
18.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
15.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.03.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2019 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
11.12.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.06.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |