EP2236964 - Method and device for low-temperature air separation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lochner, Stefan Wiesenweg 9b 85567 Grafing / DE | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Imhof, Dietmar, et al Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Imhof, Dietmar, et al Linde AG Technology & Innovation Corporate Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Imhof, Dietmar, et al Linde AG Legal Services Intellectual Property Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 09008224.9 | 23.06.2009 | [2010/40] | Priority number, date | DE20091014557 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009014557 | [2010/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236964 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2236964 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
F25J3/044 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/02 (KR);
B01D3/42 (KR);
B01D53/26 (KR);
F25J3/04048 (EP,KR,US);
F25J3/0423 (EP);
F25J3/04236 (EP,KR,US);
F25J3/04284 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2200/72 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2200/94 (EP);
F25J2245/02 (EP,US);
F25J2250/02 (EP,US);
F25J2250/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/47] |
Former [2010/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Tieftemperatur-Luftzerlegung | [2010/40] | English: | Method and device for low-temperature air separation | [2010/40] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de séparation de l'air à basse température | [2010/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2009 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | AT | 23.06.2020 | GB | 23.06.2020 | LU | 23.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.06.2009 | |
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
AT | 23.06.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
AT | 23.06.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
AT | 23.06.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
GB | 23.06.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 23.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5363657 (NAUMOVITZ JOSEPH P [US]) [YD] 1-3,8-10 * column 3, lines 14-18 * * column 4, lines 46-55 * * figure .; table . *; | [YD]US5582034 (NAUMOVITZ JOSEPH P [US]) [YD] 1-10 * column 3, lines 37-38 * * column 4, lines 49-54 *; | [Y]US6044902 (PAHADE RAVI FULCHAND [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, lines 14-32; figures 2,7,8 *; | [Y]US2003110796 (RAMPP AUGUSTIN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0029] * * sentence zweiter, paragraph 31 ** sentence vierter, paragraph 32 * | Examination | US5711167 | by applicant | DE2261234 | US4966002 | US5363657 | US5528906 | US5582034 | US5611218 | US5934106 | DE19909744 | DE19954593 | DE19919933 | US2004244417 | DE102006027650 | US2007204652 | EP1995537 | - HAUSEN/LINDE, Tieftemperaturtechnik, (1985), pages 281 - 337 |