EP2108323 - An expandable porous mesh bag device and methods of use for reduction, filling, fixation and supporting of bone abnormalities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Spineology Group, LLC 1815 Northwestern Avenue Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuslich, Stephen, D. 10343 Delwood Road North Stillwater MN 55082 / US | 02 /
Grobler, Leon, J. Spineology, Inc., 7800 3rd Street North, Suite 600 St. Paul, MN 55128-5451 / US | 03 /
Wolfe, Steven, J. 9327 Jeffery Cottage Grove MN 55016 / US | 04 /
Ahern, James, W. 126 11th Avenue North Hopkins MN 55343 / US | [2010/16] |
Former [2009/42] | 01 /
Kuslich, Stephen, D. 10343 Delwood Road North Stillwater MN 55082 / US | ||
02 /
Grobler, Leon, J. 1202 West Aster Drive Phoenix AZ 85029 / US | |||
03 /
Wolfe, Steven, J. 9327 Jeffery Cottage Grove MN 55016 / US | |||
04 /
Ahern, James, W. 126 11th Avenue North Hopkins MN 55343 / US | Representative(s) | Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Copsey, Timothy Graham, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/42] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09009218.0 | 20.07.2001 | [2009/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2108323 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2108323 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/88 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
A61F2/441 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/0095 (EP,KR);
A61B17/1668 (EP,KR);
A61B17/1671 (EP,KR);
A61B17/1675 (EP,KR);
A61B17/68 (EP,KR);
A61B17/7098 (EP,KR);
A61B17/742 (EP,KR);
A61B17/8855 (EP,KR);
A61F2/34 (EP,KR);
A61F2/4601 (EP,KR);
A61F2/4611 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP);
A61B17/1617 (EP);
A61B17/32002 (EP);
A61B17/3472 (EP);
A61B17/8805 (EP);
A61B2017/00004 (EP);
A61B2017/00261 (EP);
A61B2017/00557 (EP);
A61F2/44 (EP);
A61F2/4607 (EP);
A61F2/461 (EP);
A61F2002/2817 (EP);
A61F2002/2828 (EP);
A61F2002/2832 (EP);
A61F2002/2835 (EP);
A61F2002/2892 (EP);
A61F2002/30032 (EP);
A61F2002/30069 (EP);
A61F2002/30242 (EP);
A61F2002/30261 (EP);
A61F2002/30448 (EP);
A61F2002/30451 (EP);
A61F2002/30581 (EP);
A61F2002/30593 (EP);
A61F2002/30718 (EP);
A61F2002/448 (EP);
A61F2002/4635 (EP);
A61F2220/005 (EP);
A61F2220/0058 (EP);
A61F2230/0071 (EP);
A61F2230/0082 (EP);
A61F2250/0031 (EP);
A61F2310/00293 (EP);
A61F2310/00353 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | Eine dehnbare, poröse Netzbeutel-Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur ihrer Verwendung für die Reduktion, die Auffüllung und die Stützung von Knochenanomalien | [2009/42] | English: | An expandable porous mesh bag device and methods of use for reduction, filling, fixation and supporting of bone abnormalities | [2009/42] | French: | Dispositif de sac maille poreux extensible et procédés d'utilisation pour la réduction, le remplissage et le support d'anomalies osseuses | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 21.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01955877.4 / EP1408888 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010955877) is 04.08.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 03.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4969888 (SCHOLTEN ARIE [US], et al) [DA] 21 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5108404 (SCHOLTEN ARIE [US], et al) [DA] 21* the whole document *; | [DX]US5549679 (KUSLICH STEPHEN D [US]) [DX] 21-24 * column 6, line 58 - column 9, line 52 * * column 11, lines 19-40 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-10,21-26,50,51 *; | [DX]US5571189 (KUSLICH STEPHEN D [US]) [DX] 21-24 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 62 * * column 11, lines 11-37 * * claim - * * figures 1-10,21-26,50,51 *; | [X]US5755797 (BAUMGARTNER WALTER [CH]) [X] 21-24 * column 4, lines 27-46 * * claim - * * figures 3,3A *; | [DX]US5972015 (SCRIBNER ROBERT M [US], et al) [DX] 21-23 * column 14, lines 8-55 * * claim - * * figure - * | by applicant | US4969888 | US5015255 | US5108404 | US5549679 | US5571189 | US5972015 | US20000219853 | US20010782176 | US20010827202 |