EP2158871 - Medical implant and method of its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/09] | Medical implant and method for its production | ||
[2010/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TuTech Innovation GmbH Harburger Schlossstrasse 6-12 21079 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität Hamburg-Harburg Schwarzenbergstrasse 95 21073 Hamburg / DE | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emmelmann, Claus Am Holzscheunenberg 16 21220 Seevetal / DE | 02 /
Rehme, Olaf Magdalenenstrasse 35 20148 Hamburg / DE | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09010576.8 | 18.08.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | DE20081045020 | 29.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008045020 | [2010/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2158871 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2158871 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
A61C8/0018 (EP);
A61C13/0013 (EP);
A61C13/0018 (EP);
A61C2008/0046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinisches Implantat und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2010/09] | English: | Medical implant and method of its manufacture | [2010/13] | French: | Implant médical et son procédé de fabrication | [2010/09] |
Former [2010/09] | Medical implant and method for its production | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 08.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2011 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005256563 (CLERC CLAUDE O [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-22 * [A] 5-17; | [XA]EP0526682 (OSCOBAL AG [CH]) [X] 1,7-11 * column 3, line 8 - column 6, line 27 * * column 7, lines 28-41; figures 1-4,11,14-16 * [A] 2-6,12-17; | [XA]EP0224890 (KARL MARX STADT TECH HOCHSCHUL [DD]) [X] 1,6,9-11 * page 4, lines 10-29; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-5,7,8,12-17; | [XAY]WO2005069029 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 13,14 * page 3, line 16 - page 6, line 4; figures 1,2 * [A] 17 [Y] 15,16; | [Y]DE19514740 (EOS ELECTRO OPTICAL SYST [DE]) [Y] 15,16 * column 2, line 10 - column 5, line 60; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1800700 (HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP [US]) [A] 13-17 * page 4, line 12 - page 14, line 3; figures 1-24 * | by applicant | DE19523038 | DE4105165 | DE19707310 | DE4217082 |