|
12.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
02.11.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2018 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
29.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
15.05.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.02.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
09.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.12.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
29 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.07.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2010 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |