|
06.07.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.07.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.02.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.07.2013 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2013 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.02.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2010 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.2010 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2010 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |