EP2108453 - Portable device for crushing pills and method for using said device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quattron Techniek B.V. Tinstraat 28 2984 AN Ridderkerk / NL | [2009/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Dungen, Frans W.M. Lijsterbeslaan 76 3053 NL Rotterdam / NL | 02 /
Westerhof, Nicolaas B. Graaf Florisstraat 118a 3021 CN Rotterdam / NL | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Ferguson BV Da Costaplein 3 3818 HE Amersfoort / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Ferguson, Alexander, et al Octrooibureau Ferguson BV P.O. Box 970 3800 AZ Amersfoort / NL | ||
Former [2009/42] | Reynvaan, Lambertus Johannes Octrooibureau Reynvaan Twintighoevenweg 13 3312 LS Dordrecht / NL | Application number, filing date | 09075160.3 | 02.04.2009 | [2009/42] | Priority number, date | NL20081035277 | 09.04.2008 Original published format: NL 1035277 | [2009/42] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2108453 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2108453 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B02C1/04, A61J7/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
B02C1/04 (EP);
A61J7/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/42] | B02C19/08, A61J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tragbare Vorrichtung zum Zerdrücken von Tabletten und Verfahren zur Verwendung der Vorrichtung | [2009/42] | English: | Portable device for crushing pills and method for using said device | [2009/42] | French: | Dispositif portable pour la fragmentation de pilules et procédé d'utilisation de ce dispositif | [2009/42] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 18.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7051963 (BUCKLEY THOMAS L [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008036323 (DONOVAN IND INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6523766 (WATT RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5067666 |