EP2081013 - Method of inspecting food and inspection apparatus implementing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Masato c/o intellectual Property Department Yokohama Work of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Okuno, Toshiaki c/o Intellectual Property Department Yokohama Work of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Katayama, Makoto c/o Intellectual Property Department Yokohama Work of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Shimazu, Takayuki c/o Intellectual Property Department Yokohama Work of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2009/32] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
Tanaka, Masato c/o intellectual Property Department Yokohama Work of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Okuno, Toshiaki c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Katayama, Makoto c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
04 /
Shimazu, Takayuki c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09150729.3 | 16.01.2009 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | JP20080009551 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008009551 | [2009/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081013 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, G01N21/88, G01N33/02 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/02 (EP,US);
G01N21/3563 (EP,US);
G01N21/359 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Inspektion von Lebensmitteln und Vorrichtung dafür | [2009/30] | English: | Method of inspecting food and inspection apparatus implementing the same | [2009/30] | French: | Méthode d'analyse d'articles alimentaires et dispositif associé | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004146615 (MCDONALD JOHN THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0159] * * paragraph [0215] * * paragraph [0236] - paragraph [0238] * * paragraph [0319] - paragraph [0332]; figures 16-20 * * paragraph [0346] - paragraph [0348] *; | [X]US2002008055 (CAMPBELL DUNCAN B [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0056]; figures 8-10 * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0116]; figures 18-20 *; | [A]US2004136569 (DALEY WAYNE DWIGHT ROOMES [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0045]; figures 4,-7 *; | [A]WO9640452 (AGRI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 4 - page 10, line L; figures 1-4 * * page 13, line 18 - page 16, line 28; figures 9-18 * | by applicant | JP2004301690 | JP2007010647 | JP2000157936 | JP2001099783 |