EP2088334 - Crimped assembly of three parts with overlapping of two of these parts for matching them, and method of manufacturing such an assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malaterre, Hervé 18 avenue Charles de Gaulle 91830 Le Coudray Montceaux / FR | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Allain, Laurent Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle (LG081) 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Allain, Laurent Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle (LG081) 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 09151360.6 | 26.01.2009 | [2009/33] | Priority number, date | FR20080050704 | 05.02.2008 Original published format: FR 0850704 | [2009/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088334 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/00, B21D39/02, B62D65/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
B21D39/02 (EP);
B21D39/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | Einpressmontage von drei Teilen mit Überlappung von zwei dieser Teile zu deren Befestigung und Herstellungsverfahren eines solchen Montageverbunds | [2009/33] | English: | Crimped assembly of three parts with overlapping of two of these parts for matching them, and method of manufacturing such an assembly | [2009/33] | French: | Assemblage serti de trois pièces avec chevauchement de deux de ces pièces pour leur accostage et procédé de fabrication d'un tel assemblage | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/12] | 31.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2216036 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |