EP2091025 - Access control method, corresponding device and computer program product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.03.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingenico Group 28-32 Boulevard de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2015/46] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Compagnie Industrielle et Financiere d'Ingenierie "Ingenico" 192 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naccache, David 52 rue Letort 75018, Paris / FR | 02 /
Dolique, Christophe 18 bis rue Raymond Cosson 92150, Suresnes / FR | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Bioret, Ludovic Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16 B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09152624.4 | 11.02.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | FR20080050884 | 12.02.2008 Original published format: FR 0850884 | [2009/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091025 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G07C11/00, G06Q10/00, G07C9/00 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
G07C11/00 (EP,US);
G07C9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | Zugriffskontrollverfahren sowie entsprechende Vorrichtung und entsprechendes Computerprogrammprodukt | [2009/34] | English: | Access control method, corresponding device and computer program product | [2009/34] | French: | Procédé de contrôle d'accès, dispositif et produit programme d'ordinateur correspondants | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 15.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/41] | 15.03.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02084556 (PRYTZ SVEN [SE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph L * * page 10, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph L ** page 14, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph 3 *; | [X]EP1420370 (MYMOBILETIMES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0042] *; | [X]WO2005038688 (DISNEY ENTPR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0090] * | Examination | WO2005124699 | EP1769467 |