EP2223875 - Multi-tray sheet feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neopost Technologies 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Haan, Hendrik Andries Menno van Coehoornweg 4 9251 LV Bergum / NL | 02 /
Oosterhoff, Hans Lindbergstraat 33H 9703 BM Hoogeveen / NL | 03 /
Deen, Jurek Nicolaj Fruitweide 29 8043 XD Zwolle / NL | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Hatzmann, Martin Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09153997.3 | 27.02.2009 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223875 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/26 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
B65H1/26 (EP,US);
B65H2405/32 (EP,US);
B65H2405/332 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/18] |
Former [2010/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blattzuführung mit mehreren Blatträgern | [2010/35] | English: | Multi-tray sheet feeder | [2010/35] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation de feuille à plateaux multiples | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2001294331 (CANON KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 4-6; | [A]EP1084973 (NEOPOST BV [NL]) [A] 1-6 * column 9 - column 14; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2008001342 (MATSUSHIMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 49 - column 66; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US2006237893 (NEMOTO AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 30 - column 43; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | JPS59167423 |