EP2182040 - Aromatic compounds and organic electronic device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gracel Display Inc. 5th Floor, Samyang Techno Town 284-25 Seongsoo-2Ga-3dong Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-833 / KR | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eum, Sung Jin Gwanakbyucksanblooming Apt. 208-1606 Bongcheon 9-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Cho, Young Jun 101-1111 Samsung Apt. 15-1 Donam-dong Seongbuk-gu 136-060, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kwon, Hyuck Joo 224-2001 Samsung Raemian 2 Cha Apt. Jangan dong Dongdaemun-gu 130-100, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Bong Ok 101-1108 Hansol Apt. 4 Samseong-dong Gangnam-gu 135-090, Seoul / KR | 05 /
KIM, Sung Min 102 Salremhouse Hwagok 8-dong 392-27 Gangseo-gu 157-886, Seoul / KR | 06 /
Yoon, Seung Soo 405-1409 Samik Apt. Suseo-dong Gangnam-gu 135-884, Seoul / KR | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09156604.2 | 30.03.2009 | [2010/18] | Priority number, date | KR20080107606 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080107606 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2182040 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2182040 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | [2011/11] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,CN);
C07D241/36 (KR);
C07D471/06 (CN);
C07D471/16 (CN);
C07D497/04 (KR);
C07D498/04 (KR);
C07F7/0812 (CN);
C07F7/0816 (CN);
C07F9/65683 (CN);
H10K85/40 (CN);
H10K85/624 (CN);
H10K85/626 (CN);
H10K85/631 (CN);
H10K85/633 (CN);
H10K85/636 (EP,CN);
H10K85/654 (CN);
H10K85/657 (CN);
H10K85/6572 (EP,CN);
H10K85/6574 (CN);
C09K2211/1007 (EP,CN);
C09K2211/1011 (EP);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,CN);
C09K2211/1033 (EP);
C09K2211/1044 (EP);
C09K2211/1088 (EP);
C09K2211/1092 (EP);
C09K2211/185 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/18] | C09K11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/09] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aromatische Verbindungen und organische elektronische Vorrichtung damit | [2010/18] | English: | Aromatic compounds and organic electronic device using the same | [2010/18] | French: | Composés aromatiques et dispositif électronique organique utilisant ceux-ci | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 19.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 05.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05107784 (KAO CORP) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH11339868 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2006033563 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4-9; | [X]WO2006070185 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3* claims 1-58 *; | [XI]CN101143830 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4-9; | [XI]WO2008066358 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4-9 | by applicant | - EL LAYER, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1987), vol. 51, page 913 |