|
23.12.2015 |
Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Withdrawal of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
21.09.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2015 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.03.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2014 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
83 |