EP2101187 - Improved data messaging efficiency for an assisted wireless position determination system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rowitch, Douglas N. 2009 De Mayo Road Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
Patrick, Christopher 14358 Dalhousie Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | O'Neill, Aoife, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | O'Neill, Aoife, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09164338.7 | 26.05.2005 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | US20040854981 | 26.05.2004 Original published format: US 854981 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2101187 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2101187 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S1/00, G01S5/14, H04W64/00 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/05 (EP,KR,US);
G01S19/25 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Datenbenachrichtigungseffizienz für ein unterstütztes drahtloses Positionsbestimmungssystem | [2009/38] | English: | Improved data messaging efficiency for an assisted wireless position determination system | [2009/38] | French: | Efficacité améliorées de messagerie de données pour un système aidé de détermination de position sans fil | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 15.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05755075.8 / EP1749215 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | HU | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | IE | 26.05.2011 | LU | 26.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.05.2011 | ||
LU | 26.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.05.2011 | ||
LU | 26.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.05.2011 | ||
LU | 26.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6075987 (CAMP WILLIAM O JR [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 57 *; | [A]US2002005802 (BRYANT RODERICK C [AU], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0010] , [0017] , [0039] - [0041] - [0062] , [0076] - [0078] *; | [A]US6429808 (KING THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-9* column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 42 * |