|
07.01.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2018 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
18.05.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Description submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
14.03.2018 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2018 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.02.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2017 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
28.04.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
26.02.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
170 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
08.06.2010 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |