|
15.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.09.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.07.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
18 |
|
24.12.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
16 |
|
24.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.12.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
17.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.09.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |