EP2172525 - Crosslinkable materials based on organosilicon compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prasse, Marko Strasse der Jugend 34 01612 Glaubitz / DE | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Budczinski, Angelika, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Budczinski, Angelika, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09170555.8 | 17.09.2009 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | DE20081042632 | 06.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008042632 | [2010/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2172525 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2172525 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/10, C08L71/02, C08L33/08 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
C08G65/336 (EP,US);
C07F7/18 (KR);
C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08L83/06 (KR);
C09J183/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | Vernetzbare Massen auf der Basis von Organosiliciumverbindungen | [2010/14] | English: | Crosslinkable materials based on organosilicon compounds | [2010/14] | French: | Masses réticlulables à base de composés organosiliciés | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/14] | Outil d'éclairage et dispositif d'affichage extérieur | Examination procedure | 17.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 02.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | HR | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | IE | 23.03.2011 | IT | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | MK | 23.03.2011 | MT | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | SM | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | NO | 23.06.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | ES | 04.07.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | LU | 17.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MK | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
SM | 23.03.2011 | ||
TR | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
LU | 17.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MK | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
SM | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
LU | 17.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MK | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
SM | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MK | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MK | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 23.03.2011 | |
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1765928 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0109]; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1873208 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * example 1; claim - *; | [PA]EP2031024 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]) [PA] 1-10 * example 1; claim - * | by applicant | US2003153671 | EP1370602 | US7211616 | EP1873208 |