EP2298382 - Device for injecting contrast products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMC-Swiss Medical Care S.A. Avenue de Sevelin 28 1004 Lausanne / CH | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duffour, Hervé Swiss Medical Care Immeuble "Le Portique" Av. de Sevelin 28 1004 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
Neftel, Frédéric ch. de Bellevue 36 1005 Lausanne / CH | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 09170730.7 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298382 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M5/14 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
A61M5/007 (EP,US);
A61M5/1408 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Injizieren von Kontrastmitteln | [2011/12] | English: | Device for injecting contrast products | [2011/12] | French: | Dispositif pour l'injection de produits de contraste | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 03.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007213848 (DEKEMP ROBERT A [CA], et al) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 3,7a,8a *; | [I]EP1867356 (SWISS MEDICAL CARE [CH]) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0033] * | by applicant | US7267667 | US5911252 |