EP2301504 - Undergarment for use with an absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Attends Healthcare AB Box 173 578 24 Aneby / SE | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svensson, Ida Lönnholmsgatan 5 554 50, JÖNKÖPING / SE | 02 /
Håkansson, Mikael Storspovsgatan 5 573 37, TRANÅS / SE | 03 /
Persson, Christer Skogsgatan 28 578 31, ANEBY / SE | 04 /
Lindqvist, Arne Viksängsvägen 24 152 57, SÖDERTÄLJE / SE | [2011/13] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Edlund, Fabian, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11 394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Fritsche, Daniel, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Jacobsson, Peter Awapatent AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 09171124.2 | 23.09.2009 | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301504 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/66, A61F13/74 | [2011/13] | CPC: |
A61F13/66 (EP);
A61F13/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Unterwäsche zur Verwendung mit einem absorbierenden Artikel | [2011/13] | English: | Undergarment for use with an absorbent article | [2011/13] | French: | Sous-vêtement pour une utilisation avec un article absorbant | [2011/13] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3315677 (TYRRELL JR WALLACE B) [Y] 3,11 * column 2, lines 45-60; figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE1435883 (MENSE INC) [X] 1-3,8,11-12,14 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE9411197U (SCHUPP WUNIBALD [DE]) [A] 3* the whole document *; | [XDY]US5415650 (SIGL WAYNE C [US]) [XD] 1-2,8,12-13,15 * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 31; figure -; claims 1,3,4,7 * [Y] 3,11; | [X]US2003191444 (WADA MITSUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-6,8,11-13 * paragraphs [0051] , [0056]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US6807685 (HASEGAWA MAYUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-6,8,12-13 * figure -; claim - * | Examination | WO2006071161 | by applicant | GB1221002 | US4664663 | US5415650 |