EP2305785 - Use of a carboxylic or amino compound as cleaning aid for hard surfaces and method of cleaning such hard surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winter, Jeremy Unilever R&D Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East Bebington, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
Stirling, Thomas Unilever R&D Port Sunlight, Quarry Road East Bebington, Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M., et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 09172116.7 | 02.10.2009 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2305785 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D3/33, C11D3/34 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
C11D3/0036 (EP);
C11D3/2086 (EP);
C11D3/33 (EP);
C11D3/349 (EP);
C11D2111/14 (EP);
C11D3/3427 (EP);
C11D3/3472 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer Carboxyl- oder Aminoverbindung als Reinigungshilfe für harte Flächen und Verfahren zur Reinigung von harten Flächen | [2011/14] | English: | Use of a carboxylic or amino compound as cleaning aid for hard surfaces and method of cleaning such hard surfaces | [2011/14] | French: | Utilisation d'un composé carboxylique ou amino en tant qu'aide au nettoyage pour les surfaces dures et procédé de nettoyage desdites surfaces dures | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5877132 (CALLAGHAN IAN C [GB], et al) [AD] 1-15* column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 5 *; | [A]EP0908511 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0101] , [0102] *; | [ID]WO0218531 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [ID] 1-15 * page 5, lines 7-19 * * page 10, lines 7-21 * * page 18, lines 18-26 * * claims 1-5, 12-18, 25-30 *; | [XI]US2004023824 (ZUEECHNER LARS [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0016] , [0019] * * claims 1-4, 9, 11 * [I] 6-15; | [AD]WO2006108475 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 15 * * example - * * claim - * | by applicant | GB458163 | DE2014883 | DE1942236 | WO9429420 | WO9503389 | US5877132 | WO0218531 | WO03007289 | WO2006108475 |