|
22.04.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
14.04.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2022 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2022 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.01.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.10.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.09.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.06.2021 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.05.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.09.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.05.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
11.03.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2019 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
08.11.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2010 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2010 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |